Tien, Homer Chin-Nan (CPSO#: 65162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5850
Fax: (416) 480-5851
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite H186
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5850


Corporation Name: Brenneman Chu Tien Tremblay Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )
Dr. F. Brenneman ( CPSO# 59446 )
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 62432 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOMER CHIN-NAN TIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993