Tinmouth, Alan Thomas (CPSO#: 68306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Ottawa Blood Disease Centre L2265
Box 201a
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73914
Fax: (613) 739-6888
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan T. Tinmouth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tinmouth ( CPSO# 68306 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Clinical Epidemiology
501 Smyth Road
Room L2265c Box 201
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN THOMAS TINMOUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINMOUTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1998