Tinmouth, Jill Margaret (CPSO#: 69342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:New York Univ School of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue, Rm HG40
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5910
Fax: (416) 480-4845
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

585 University Ave.
Peter Munk Building (PMB),13th floo
Rm 1300
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: 416 340-4800 Ext. 8172
Fax: (416) 340-4890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jill Tinmouth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tinmouth ( CPSO# 69342 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
HG40 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5910

Business Address:
13N-1300 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-5077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL MARGARET TINMOUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINMOUTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999