Tishler, Steven Jonathan (CPSO#: 62483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 306-8404
Fax: (905) 277-0136
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Ronson Drive, Suite 104
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Tishler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tishler ( CPSO# 62483 )
Dr. S. Sandler ( CPSO# 66595 )

Business Address:
LMC Bayview
Suite 107
1929 Bayview
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9

Business Address:
600 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 306-8404

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JONATHAN TISHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TISHLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991