Titis, Apostolos (CPSO#: 83289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-6887
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apostolos Titis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Titis ( CPSO# 83289 )

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6887

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APOSTOLOS TITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TITIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007