Tittley, Jacques (CPSO#: 52938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton ST. East
5 North Suite 508
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44499
Fax: (905) 521-1284
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Tittley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tittley ( CPSO# 52938 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Suite 508
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (925) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3S5
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street West
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUES TITTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TITTLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1984