Tjon, Peter Edwin (CPSO#: 69260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
9889 Markham Rd.
Markham ON  L6E 0B7
Phone: (905) 294-4467
Fax: (905) 294-8925
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tsin ( CPSO# 69257 )
Dr. P. Tjon ( CPSO# 69260 )

Business Address:
9889 Markham Road
Unit 208
Markham ON  L6E 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 294-4467

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-2727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER EDWIN TJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997