To, Karen Chia-Ying (CPSO#: 84296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Nephrology
3rd Floor Marian, M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen To Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. To ( CPSO# 84296 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
M318-50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor Marian Wing
Department of Nephrology
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN CHIA-YING TO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010