Todd, Judith Mary (CPSO#: 65604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CODSELL MEDICAL
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 3V6
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juda Habot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Todd ( CPSO# 65604 )
Dr. J. Habot ( CPSO# 65575 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 885-4521

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-0046

Business Address:
Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Lower Level
Toronto ON  M3H 3Y6
Phone Number: (647) 699-9800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH MARY TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2001