Tolami Hemmati, Nasim (CPSO#: 91278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nasim Tolami Hemmati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tolami Hemmati ( CPSO# 91278 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASIM TOLAMI HEMMATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLAMI HEMMATI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 10 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 10 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2014