Tomc, John Edward (CPSO#: 58358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 204
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-6461
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. E. Tomc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tomc ( CPSO# 58358 )

Business Address:
204 - 2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-6461

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN EDWARD TOMC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1988