Tong, Jennifer Nihua (CPSO#: 89317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone: (289) 396-2794
Fax: (289) 396-1847
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Good Doctors Medical Clinics
1984 Regent St., Unit 126
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S1
Canada
Phone: 18886375485
Fax: (705) 805-0194
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tong ( CPSO# 89317 )
Dr. A. Moreno ( CPSO# 89368 )

Business Address:
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone Number: (289) 396-2794

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
126 - 1984 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As from June 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jennifer Nihua Tong
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tong to the College
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Tong has voluntarily ceased to practise emergency medicine, and shall
                  give a minimum of two (2) months' notice to the College of her intention
                  to resume practice in this area.