Tong, Xiaoxing (CPSO#: 82992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 4K9
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Valley Institute for Women
1575 Homer Watson Blvd
Kitchener ON
N2P 2C5
Kitchener ON  N2P 2C5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
Kitchener ON
N2M 1B2
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: X. Tong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Tong ( CPSO# 82992 )

Business Address:
1575 Homer Watson Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2P 2C5
Phone Number: (519) 894-2011

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 4K9
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 23 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIAOXING TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007