Tosoni, Caroline Marie Anne (CPSO#: 68936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A
110 Clarence street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P6
Phone: (613) 244-5151
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

570 Lacolle
Orleans ON  K4A 5N9
Canada
Phone: 613-244-5151
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Tosoni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tosoni ( CPSO# 68936 )

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 5N9
Phone Number: (613) 244-5151

Business Address:
110A Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P6
Phone Number: (613) 244-5151

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE ANNE TOSONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOSONI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998