Towheed, Tanveer Ezad (CPSO#: 60683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 2066
Queen's University, 94 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6896
Fax: (613) 533-2189
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

102-1473 John Counter Blvd
City Place II
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6
Canada
Phone: 6135336896
Fax: 6135332189
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tanveer E. Towheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Towheed ( CPSO# 60683 )

Business Address:
Queens University
Etherington Hall, Department of Medicine
94 Stuart Street Room 2066
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6896

Business Address:
1473 John Counter Boulevard
Suite 102
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANVEER EZAD TOWHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOWHEED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990