Trabelsi, Asma (CPSO#: 87909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:FACULTE DE MEDECINE DE SFAX, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 2T0
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1111 ghislain street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Canada
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Trabelsi ( CPSO# 87909 )

Business Address:
Hospital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 745-2228

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMA TRABELSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRABELSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 10 Mar 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 28 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010