Tracey, Scott Joseph (CPSO#: 86567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Tracey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tracey ( CPSO# 86567 )

Business Address:
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Suite 1C
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH TRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRACEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009