Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tran, Kham Quang (CPSO#: 64379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Fenelon Drive
Toronto ON  M3A 3K2
Phone: (416) 510 8388
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 1, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 1, 2017, Michael Garron Hospital (the ‘Hospital’) notified the College that subsequent to an investigation by the Hospital, Dr. Kham Quang Tran was granted a leave of absence from the Hospital effective February 1, 2017, with a stated intention not to reapply for privileges at the Hospital in the next appointment year beginning July 1, 2017.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHAM QUANG TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 1991 to 26 Jul 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015