Tran, Phuong Pho (CPSO#: 66962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 925
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-1616
Fax: (416) 597-2073
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 261-3500
Fax: (416) 266-9400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phuong P. Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tran ( CPSO# 66962 )

Business Address:
925 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-1616

Business Address:
1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E5
Phone Number: (416) 261-3500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHUONG PHO TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1999