Tran, Quoc Hung (CPSO#: 68876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#1-180 McNaughton Ave. W
Chatham ON  N7M 4Z7
Phone: (519)354-6440
Fax: 519-397-3061
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quoc Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Tran ( CPSO# 68876 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
180 McNaughton Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 4Z7
Phone Number: (519) 437-5844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUOC HUNG TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999