Travers, Carolyn Anne (CPSO#: 105914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T1B4
Canada
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Edwards ( CPSO# 103114)
Dr. C. Travers ( CPSO# 105914)

Business Address:
Grey-Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN ANNE TRAVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAVERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2017