Travers, Sean Arthur (CPSO#: 69014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
P O Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Travers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Travers ( CPSO# 69014 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN ARTHUR TRAVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAVERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000