Trebb, Christopher James (CPSO#: 98625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2015 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone: (705) 222-6337
Fax: (705) 222-0706
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705-523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher James Trebb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trebb ( CPSO# 98625 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P3A 2T4

Business Address:
2015 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone Number: (705) 222-6337

Business Address:
1140 South Bay Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 0B6
Phone Number: (705) 674-2846

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES TREBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREBB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014