Tremblay, Lorraine Norah (CPSO#: 63991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5255
Fax: (416) 480-5499
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenneman Chu Tien Tremblay Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )
Dr. F. Brenneman ( CPSO# 59446 )
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 62432 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255


Corporation Name: Lorraine Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (419) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE NORAH TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992