Trier, Jessica Marie (CPSO#: 88564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Ratcliffe, Jessica Marie (used until: 01 Dec 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53286
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Trier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trier ( CPSO# 88564 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 25 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA MARIE TRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2012 to 03 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2013 to 04 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014