Trimble, Nancy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 792-2145
Fax: (705) 792-2147
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Trimble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Trimble ( CPSO# 58190 )

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 104
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 792-2145

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ELIZABETH TRIMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIMBLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1989