Trinchuk, Olena Volodymyrivna (CPSO#: 107885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Odessa Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
200 Spadina AVE
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone: (416) 203-8600
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3077 Bathurst St, North York
Toronto ON  M6A 1Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 782-7772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olena Trinchuk, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Trinchuk ( CPSO# 107885)

Business Address:
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 780-9986

Business Address:
3077 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 1Z9
Phone Number: (416) 782-7222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLENA VOLODYMYRIVNA TRINCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016