Trinh, Kien Vinh (CPSO#: 64980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ancaster Sports Medicine Centre
1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone: (905) 648-4425
Fax: (905) 648-4426
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kien Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Trinh ( CPSO# 64980 )

Business Address:
Ancaster Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation Centre
1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 648-4425

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIEN VINH TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993