Tripp, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 82597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Parsons, Julie Anne (used until: 30 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 850-3238
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Citi Plaza
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE TRIPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIPP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007