Tropper, Joseph Rodolphe Guy (CPSO#: 52875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 Boul de Mortagne
Suite 260
Boucherville QC  J4B 5E4
Phone: (450) 641-0155
Fax: (450) 641-9133
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

820 McConnell Avenue
Suite 122
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-1466
Fax: (613) 938-2674
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Tropper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tropper ( CPSO# 52875 )

Business Address:
122 - 820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 938-1466

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH RODOLPHE GUY TROPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROPPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1988