Trottier, Daniel Constant Joseph (CPSO#: 79130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 2400
Fax: (613) 748-4914
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Asclepios Clinic
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Canada
Phone: (613) 833-2310
Fax: (613) 833-3698
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel C. Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Trottier ( CPSO# 79130 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 833-2310

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 833-2310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL CONSTANT JOSEPH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008