Truchon, Michel Leo (CPSO#: 32605)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Truchon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 28, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Michel Leo Truchon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2015:

Dr. Truchon has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine due to illness and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.