Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Trudel, Jean-Rene (CPSO#: 52971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 706
2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X3
Phone: (613) 800-5402
Fax: (613) 523-1243
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Rene Trudel Societe Professionnelle De Medecine

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trudel ( CPSO# 52971 )

Business Address:
Suite 706
2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X3
Phone Number: (613) 800-5402

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-RENE TRUDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1983