Tse, Yvonne Yee Wun (CPSO#: 88545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
8MP 328
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5114
Fax: (416) 603-6204
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yvonne Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Tse ( CPSO# 88545 )

Business Address:
Room 8MP- 328
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5276

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE YEE WUN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012