Tsihlias, John (CPSO#: 64077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 746-4805
Fax: (416) 746-4807
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Tsihlias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tsihlias ( CPSO# 64077 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 746-4805

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TSIHLIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIHLIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992