Tsin, Karen Weichuan (CPSO#: 69257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 754-2727
Fax: (416) 754-2728
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tsin ( CPSO# 69257 )
Dr. P. Tjon ( CPSO# 69260 )

Business Address:
9889 Markham Road
Unit 208
Markham ON  L6E 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 294-4467

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-2727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WEICHUAN TSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997