Tsui, Andrew Kar Wai (CPSO#: 75201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 534-6699
Fax: (416) 534-0172
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office at Richview
250 Wincott Drive, Unit 12
Toronto ON  M9R2R5
Canada
Phone: 416-249-0002
Fax: 4162490842
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI The Doctor's Office at Atrium
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G2C2
Canada
Phone: 416-598-1703
Fax: 416-598-1778
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tsui ( CPSO# 75201 )

Business Address:
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Unit 308
Toronto ON  M6R 2L2
Phone Number: (416) 534-6699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW KAR WAI TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002