Tsui, Kwan Cheung (CPSO#: 52340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite B1
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745 8050
Fax: (416) 745 1125
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 63620
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. C. Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWAN CHEUNG TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1983