Tu, Jack Ven (CPSO#: 59481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health
Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room G106
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4700
Fax: (416) 480-6048
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jack Ven Tu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tu ( CPSO# 59481 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G106 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6083

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK VEN TU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989