Tugaleva, Elena (CPSO#: 79796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Donetsk Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36374
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oleg Tugalev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Tugalev ( CPSO# 78078 )
Dr. E. Tugaleva ( CPSO# 79796 )

Business Address:
35 Springbank Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 7P6
Phone Number: (519) 537-6147

Business Address:
355 Wellington
Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA TUGALEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUGALEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009