Tullio, Gerald Christopher (CPSO#: 69907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone: (905) 456-8010
Fax: (905) 456-3885
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 500
145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-8010
Fax: (905) 456-3885
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD CHRISTOPHER TULLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001