Tumber, Perm Paul Singh (CPSO#: 67183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
M C L 2 - 405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 grenville street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6008
Fax: 416-323-6169
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

TLC Laser Eye Centers
2345 yonge street, Suite 212
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Canada
Phone: 416-733-2020
Fax: 416-545-0049
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mt. SInai Hospital
600 Universtiy Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8676
Fax: (416) 586-8281
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tumber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tumber ( CPSO# 67183 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERM PAUL SINGH TUMBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1998 to 30 Mar 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993