Tumi, Kamaleddin Hussein (CPSO#: 70642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Plastic and Cosmetic Surgery
Suite 102
34 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 737-9235
Fax: (705) 737-9469
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamaleddin Tumi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tumi ( CPSO# 70642 )

Business Address:
102 - 34 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 737-9235

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMALEDDIN HUSSEIN TUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004