Tung Barnett, Sabrina Shiu Won (CPSO#: 101009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HealthPark Medical Clinics
370 Bayview Drive, Suite 200
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Tung Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tung Barnett ( CPSO# 101009)

Business Address:
Suite 200
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
3rd Floor Rotary Place
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3333

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABRINA SHIU WON TUNG BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016