Tupchong, Michele Ann (CPSO#: 68193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 - 6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 471-4402
Fax: (905) 471-1903
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dancey Tupchong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tupchong ( CPSO# 68193 )
Dr. D. Dancey ( CPSO# 68096 )

Business Address:
302 - 6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 471-4402

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANN TUPCHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUPCHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999