Turnbull, John Douglas (CPSO#: 33602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 4U7
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76365
Fax: (905) 521-2656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Parlee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Turnbull ( CPSO# 33602 )
Dr. K. Parlee ( CPSO# 33125 )
Dr. M. Turnbull ( CPSO# 109772)

Business Address:
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 3N6

Business Address:
2757 King Street
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS TURNBULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNBULL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982