Turner, Frances Norma (CPSO#: 55487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Greenbrook Drive
Unit 7
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 570-1655
Fax: (519) 570-3477
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances N. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Turner ( CPSO# 55487 )

Business Address:
7 - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 570-1655

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES NORMA TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1993