Turner, Maria Dawn (CPSO#: 81286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sexual Health Clinic
10 Downie St., 2nd Floor
Stratford ON  N5A 7K4
Canada
Phone: (519) 271-7600 Ext. 779
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Turner ( CPSO# 81286 )
Dr. M. Powell ( CPSO# 81211 )

Business Address:
Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 348-8402

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA DAWN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005