Turner, Robert Douglas (CPSO#: 26027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 748-4041
Fax: (705) 748-3907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert D. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Turner ( CPSO# 26027 )

Business Address:
103 - 380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 748-4041

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Zimbabwe

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005