Turner, Tyrone Silvio (CPSO#: 24637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4390
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C4
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807 684 6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tyrone Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Turner ( CPSO# 24637 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P8A 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 8V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TYRONE SILVIO TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972